Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||
1162
ELECTION OF PART-TIME FACULTY
- Miss Anne G. Alley as Lecturer in Speech Communication, one-third time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Lowell D. Ashby, Jr., as Instructor in History, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Miss Mary D. Baker as Instructor in Chemistry, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. George M. Bell as Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, one-tenth time, (Roanoke Program), for the period August 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Mr. Ernest R. Bevan, Jr., as Lecturer in English, two-thirds time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. W. Blaker Bolling as Instructor in Business Administration, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. David N. Bottoms, Jr., as Lecturer in Law, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective January 16, 1977.
- Mrs. Deanna S. Brummett as Instructor in Education, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. James G. Cosby as Lecturer in Law, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Oliver D. Dailey as Instructor in Chemistry, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Ann D. Dunn as Visiting Assistant Professor of Biology, three-fourths time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. James W. Dyke, Jr., as Lecturer in Law, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Frank A. Elston as Instructor in Economics, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Mary Lee Epps as Lecturer in Economics, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Michael L. Fletcher as Instructor in Economics, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Nicolaos G. Flytzanis as Assistant Professor of Physics, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Christopher H. Galfo as Instructor in Physics, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. Richard D. Giles as Assistant Professor of Family Practice, (Lynchburg), for one year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Miss Susan J. Heeger as Lecturer in English, one-third time, for one academic year.
- Mr. Dale W. Henderson as Lecturer in Economics, one-half time, for one semester, effective January 16, 1977.
- Mr. Karl C. Henderson as Lecturer in Electrical Engineering, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976. Mr. Henderson is a member of the professional staff of the Research Laboratories for the Engineering Sciences.
- Dr. John M. Hiebert as Instructor in Plastic Surgery, one-fifth time, for one year, effective July 1, 1976.
- Mr. Thomas M. Humphrey as Lecturer in Economics, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. William G. Jordan as Assistant Professor of Psychiatry, part-time, Roanoke Program, for the period April 1, 1976, through June 30, 1978.
- Mr. Ian H. C. Kennedy as Lecturer in English, one-third time, for one semester, effective January 16, 1977.
- Mr. William K. Klingaman as Instructor in History, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. John T. Kneebone as Instructor in History, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective January 16, 1977.
- Mr. Weldon H. Latham as Lecturer in Law, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Barry A. Love as Instructor in Economics, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Ronald L. Marmer as Instructor in Speech Communication, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. Jeffrey L. Marsh as Instructor in Plastic Surgery, one-fifth time, for one year, effective July 1, 1976.
- Miss Michelle B. McAlpin as Visiting Assistant Professor of History, one-half time, for one semester.
- Mrs. Ellen A. McWhirter as Lecturer in English, one-third time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Helen Moyer as Instructor in Spanish, one-third time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. William J. Reid, Jr., as Instructor in Economics, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Ladhi Rinpoche as Lecturer in Religious Studies, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Marilyn S. Rosmann as Assistant Professor of Nursing, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Halford R. Ryan as Visiting Assistant Professor of Speech Communication, one-third time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Marena Senderovich as Lecturer in Russian, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Donald K. Stauble as Instructor in Environmental Sciences, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Enid Veron as Acting Assistant Professor of Humanities, one-half time, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mrs. Sandra M. Wall as Assistant Professor of Nursing, one-half time, for the period September 1, 1976, through December 31, 1976.
- Mr. Randolph D. Werner as Instructor in History, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Thomas G. Wolaver as Instructor in Environmental Sciences, one-half time, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Miss Joan Zimmerman as Instructor in History, one-fourth time, for one semester, effective January 16, 1977.
1163
1164
1165
Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||