Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||
1161
ELECTION OF NON-SALARIED FACULTY
- Dr. Raphael H. Greenstein as Clinical Associate Professor of Internal Medicine, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Mr. Frank P. Hunter, Jr., as Assistant Professor, General Faculty, Biomedical Engineering, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Mr. Bela C. Maday as Scholar-in-Residence, Department of Anthropology, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Mr. Hugh A. Moye as Visiting Scholar in Chemistry, for the period July 1, 1976, through September 30, 1976.
- Mr. Pierre A. Rinfret as Visiting Lecturer, Darden School of Graduate Business, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. Charles D. Smith as Clinical Associate Professor of Radiology, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Mr. Kenneth L. Stevens as Visiting Scholar in Chemistry, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1976.
- Lieutenant j.g., Douglas R. Stover as Assistant Professor of Naval Science, for three academic years, effective October 1, 1976.
- Mr. Samuel S. Stradling as Visiting Scholar in Chemistry, for one semester, effective September 1, 1976.
- Dr. Otoniel R. Sullesta as Clinical Assistant Professor of Radiology, Roanoke Program, for two years, effective August 1, 1976.
- Mr. Walter S. Trahanovsky as Visiting Scholar-in-Chemistry, for the period December 1, 1976, through May 31, 1977.
- Dr. Paul Wilkins as Clinical Instructor in Psychiatry, for one year, effective July 1, 1976.
- Lieutenant j.g., John H. Woodhouse, Jr., as Assistant Professor of Naval Science, for three academic years, effective September 1, 1976.
Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||