Memoirs of the war of secession | ||
COMPANY D.
Captain.
(1) M. G. Tant, 1st January, 1862.
First-Lieutenant.
(1) H. P. Lynch, 25th January, 1862. Resigned.
(2) J. H. Villeneure, 1st May, 1862. Retired.
(3) J. D. Sanders, 28th April, 1864.
385
Second-Lieutenant.
(1) J. H. Villeneure. Promoted.
(2) J. D. Sanders. Promoted.
(3) A. A. Vanderford. Died 3d July, 1864.
Junior Second-Lieutenant.
(1) J. D. Sanders. (See above.)
(2) A. A. Vanderford. (See above.)
Memoirs of the war of secession | ||