Memoirs of the war of secession | ||
STAFF.
Surgeon.
R. B. Hanahan, 30th March, 1863. Assistant Surgeon.
(1) Chas. R. Taber, December, 1861. Promoted.
(2) Wm. Weston, 2d February, 1865.
Ensign.
(1) A. P. Irby, 20th June, 1864. Resigned.
(2) Vacant.
Assistant Quartermaster.
(1) Eli Harrison, 6th March, 1862. Transferred.
(2) Office abolished.
375
Adjutant.
(1) S. W. Nelson, 20th March, 1862. Resigned.
(2) W. M. Thomas, 12th December, 1864.
Memoirs of the war of secession | ||