Board of Visitors minutes January 26, 1990 | ||
3789
Election of Clinical Faculty
- Ms. Barbara A. Body as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pathology, for the period November 6, 1989 through June 30, 1990.
- Mr. Dennis L. Hart as Clinical Associate Professor of Orthopaedics and Rehabilitation, for one year, effective December 1, 1989.
- Dr. Roger A. Hofford as Clinical Assistant Professor of Family Medicine, Lynchburg Program, for one year, effective October 1, 1989.
- Dr. Lowell F. Inhorn as Clinical Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, Roanoke Program, for the period July 1, 1989 through June 30, 1992.
- Dr. Kevin T. Kollar as Clinical Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, for three years, effective December 1, 1989.
- Dr. Katherine D. Mika as Clinical Instructor in Pediatrics, for one year, effective October 1, 1989.
- Dr. Richard W. Morton as Clinical Assistant Professor of Ophthalmology, for one year, effective October 1, 1989.
- Dr. Elizabeth A. Mumper as Clinical Associate Professor of Family Medicine, Lynchburg Program, for three years, effective June 1, 1989.
- Dr. Donna W. Newsome as Clinical Assistant Professor of Behavioral Medicine and Psychiatry, for three years, effective December 1, 1989.
- Dr. Barbara T. Post as Clinical Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, for the period September 15, 1989 through January 14, 1990.
- Ms. Carolyn A. Stanley-Tilt as Clinical Assistant Professor of Behavioral Medicine and Psychiatry, Salem Program, for the period November 1, 1989 through June 30, 1992.
- Ms. Margot L. White as Clinical Assistant Professor of Biomedical Ethics in Internal Medicine, for the period August 1, 1989 through October 31, 1989.
- Mr. Brian R. J. Williamson as Clinical Professor of Radiology, for three years, effective January 1, 1990.
Board of Visitors minutes January 26, 1990 | ||