Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||
ELECTION OF CLINICAL FACULTY
- Dr. H. Preston Boggess as Clinical Associate Professor of Pediatrics, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Dr. Paul E. Bowles as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Dr. William N. Gordge as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Dr. Francis M. Guilfoyle as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979. (Roanoke Program)
- Dr. Thomas R. Henretta as Clinical Associate Professor of Surgery, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Dr. William J. Kagey as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979. (Roanoke Program).
- Dr. David P. Minichan, Jr., as Clinical Assistant Professor of Surgery, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Dr. Douglas E. Pierce as Clinical Associate Professor of Pediatrics, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979. (Roanoke Program).
- Dr. G. Scott Reader as Clinical Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Dr. Rahmat M. Seif as Clinical Assistant Professor of Surgery, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
- Dr. D. Andrew Shapiro as Clinical Professor of Pediatrics, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979. (Roanoke Program).
- Dr. Michael Sisk as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979. (Roanoke Program).
- Dr. David C. Walton as Clinical Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1976, through June 30, 1979.
- Dr. Edwin L. Williams as Clinical Assistant Professor of Surgery, Roanoke Program, for three years, effective July 1, 1976.
1166
Board of Visitors minutes October 14, 1976 | ||