Board of Visitors minutes October 04, 2002 | ||
6303
RESIGNATIONS FROM THE CLINICAL STAFF
RESOLVED that the recommendation of the Medical Policy Council for the resignation of clinical privileges to the following practitioners are approved:
- Chekan, Edward G., M.D., Surgeon in the Department of Surgery; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: July 12, 2002.
- Epstein, Robert M., M.D., Anesthesiologist in the Department of Anesthesiology; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: June 30, 2002.
- Fryburg, David A., M.D., Physician in the Department of Internal Medicine; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: August 31, 2001.
- Gutgesell, Margaret E., M.D., Pediatrician in the Department of Pediatrics; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: July 31, 2002.
- Ibrahim, Mohamed, M.D., Surgeon in the Department of Surgery; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: September 26, 2002.
- Lazar, Andrew E., M.D., Physician in Internal Medicine in the Department of Internal Medicine; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: May 6, 2002.
- Mari, Giancarlo, M.D., Obstetrician and Gynecologist in the Department of Obstetrics and Gynecology; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: August 23, 2002.
- Matthews, Anthony J., M.D., Anesthesiologist in the Department of Anesthesiology; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: September 11, 2002.
- Mulligan, Kimberly A., M.D., Anesthesiologist in the Department of Anesthesiology; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: July 26, 2002.
- Stephan, Illene F., M.D., Physician in Internal Medicine in the Department of Internal Medicine; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: June 6, 2002.
- Stewart, Kimberly J., Ph.D., Psychologist in the Department of Psychiatric Medicine; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: June 12, 2002.
- Volkan, Vamik D., M.D., Psychiatrist in the Department of Psychiatric Medicine; Attending Staff Status; Effective date of Resignation: August 24, 2002.
6304
Board of Visitors minutes October 04, 2002 | ||