Board of Visitors minutes February 10, 1996 | ||
5101
ELECTIONS
The following resolution was adopted:
- RESOLVED that the following persons are hereby elected to the faculty:
- Dr. Joseph A. Aloi as Assistant Professor of Clinical Internal Medicine, for three years, effective January 1, 1996.
- Mr. Peter Berg as Research Assistant Professor of Environmental Sciences, for one year, effective January 16, 1996.
- Mr. Michael B. Blank as Assistant Professor of Nursing, for the period November 1, 1995 through May 31, 1998.
- Dr. Gerald L. Brown as Professor of Psychiatric Medicine, for one year, effective November 1, 1995.
- Mr. William R. Callender as Assistant Professor, General Faculty, for one year, effective November 6, 1995.
- Mr. Mikhail I. Diakonov as Visiting Professor of Electrical Engineering, for one month, effective September 1, 1995.
- Mr. J. Hunter Downs, III as Assistant Professor of Research in Neurosurgery, for one year, effective September 25, 1995.
- Mr. Frederick R. Heisterman as Assistant Professor of Clinical Psychiatric Medicine, for the period October 23, 1995.
- Dr. John D. Hendrix, Jr. as Assistant Professor of Dermatology, for three years, effective January 1, 1996.
- Ms. Elizabeth I. Merwin as Associate Professor of Nursing, effective January 1, 1996.
- Mr. Wladek Minor as Associate Professor of Molecular Physiology & Biological Physics, for five years, effective December 1, 1995.
- Ms. Lynne A. Opperman as Assistant Professor of Research in Plastic Surgery, for one year, effective October 1, 1995.
- Dr. James W. Patterson as Professor of Pathology, for one year, effective July 1, 1996.
- Mr. Eduardo A. Perozo as Assistant Professor of Molecular Physiology & Biological Physics, for three years, effective December 1, 1995.
- Mr. Mark J. Rozell as Research Associate Professor, for the period February 1, 1996 through July 31, 1996.
- Dr. Richard J. Santen as Professor of Internal Medicine, effective November 1, 1995.
- Dr. Anon Srikiatkhachorn as Assistant Professor of Research in Pediatrics, for one year, effective October 18, 1995.
- Mr. Douglas P. Wagner as Professor of Health Evaluation Sciences, effective November 1, 1995.
5102
Board of Visitors minutes February 10, 1996 | ||