Board of Visitors minutes April 8, 1961 | ||
RESIGNATIONS
The President announced the following resignations
Mr. Allison Burnett, Assistant Professor of Biology, effective 30 June 1961, to accept a
position at Western Reserve.
Mr. John E. Moes, Assistant Professor of Economics, effective 1 February 1961, to accept a
teaching position in Ethiopia.
Mr. Frisby D. Smith, Assistant Professor of Education, effective 1 July 1961, to become
Director of Instruction for the Roanoke City Public Schools.
Board of Visitors minutes April 8, 1961 | ||