Board of Visitors minutes July 12, 1946 | ||
455
CHANGES IN NAVAL PERSONNEL REPORTED BY THE PRESIDENT:
The following officers have been detached from the Naval Reserve Officers' Mraining Corps
at the University of Virginia, and their names have been removed from the list of faculty members:
Lieut. Comdr. William Francis Thompson, U.S.N.R., as of June 14, 1946.
Lieut. Comdr. Herman Louis Trautman, U.S.N.R., as of June 11, 1946.
Lieutenant John Quincy Edwards, U.S.N.R., as of June 18, 1946.
Lieut. (jg) Quentin Powell Whipple, U.S.N.R., as of June 11, 1946.
Board of Visitors minutes July 12, 1946 | ||