Board of Visitors minutes October 04, 2002 | ||
6291
THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA'S COLLEGE AT WISE
PROMOTIONS
RESOLVED that the following persons were promoted:
- Mr. Thomas M. Costa from Associate Professor of History to Professor of History, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 25, 2002.
- Ms. Kristina Feeser from Assistant Professor of Psychology to Associate Professor of Psychology, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 25, 2002.
- Ms. M. Rachel Tighe from Assistant Professor of Communication to Associate Professor of Communication, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 25, 2002.
- Mr. Kenneth J. Tiller from Assistant Professor of English to Associate Professor of English, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 25, 2002.
- Mr. Patrick W. Withen from Assistant Professor of Sociology to Associate Professor of Sociology, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 25, 2002.
SPECIAL SALARY ACTIONS
RESOLVED that the following persons received the salary indicated:
- Ms. Amy C. Clark, Lecturer, General Faculty, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective June 25, 2002, at an annual salary of $35,000.
- Mr. Larry A. Lawson, Lecturer, General Faculty, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective July 9, 2002, at an annual salary of $52,000.
- Ms. Marcia K. Quesenberry, Lecturer, General Faculty, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective July 1, 2002, at an annual salary of $95,000.
6292
RESIGNATION
The following resignation was announced:
- Ms. Kathleen W. Huttlinger, Professor of Nursing, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, effective August 24, 2002, for personal reasons.
APPOINTMENTS
The following appointments were announced:
- Ms. Claire I. Eldridge as Consultant: Campaign Planning and Lead Gifts, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, for the period July 1, 2002, through December 16, 2002.
- Ms. Marcia K. Quesenberry as Interim Vice Chancellor for Development and College Relations and Assistant to the Chancellor, The University of Virginia's College at Wise, for two years, effective July 1, 2002.
Board of Visitors minutes October 04, 2002 | ||