Board of Visitors minutes October 15, 1999 | ||
(e) Resignations of Chairholder(s)
The following resignations were announced:
Ms. Connie L. Juel as Thomas G. Jewell Professor of Education, effective July 31, 1999, to accept another position.
Dr. Oswald Steward as Harrison Foundation Professor of Neuroscience, effective June 30, 1999, to accept another position.
Mr. George G. Triantis as Nicholas E. Chimicles Research Professor of Business Law and Regulation, effective August 24, 1999, to accept another position.
Board of Visitors minutes October 15, 1999 | ||