Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||
APPOINTMENTS
The following appointments were announced:
- Ms. Kimberly D. Bynum as Head Coach of Women's Basketball, Clinch Valley College, for the period August 1, 1992 through June 30, 1994.
- Mr. LeAnder Canady as Acting Chair, Department of Visual and Performing Arts, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Sheila B. Cox as Registrar, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. George E. Culbertson as Chief Administrative and Finance Officer, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Roy W. Ely as Acting Director of Development, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Ms. Betty M. Johnson as Chair, Department of Nursing, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Richard L. Kendrick as Director of Financial Affairs, Clinch Valley College, for the period June 22, 1992 through June 30, 1995.
- Ms. Lana C. Low as Chief Institutional Advancement Officer, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Preston W. Mitchell as Head Coach, Men's Basketball, Clinch Valley College, for two years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Richard H. Peake as Chair, Department of Languages and Literatures, Clinch Valley College, for one year, effective September 1, 1992.
4519
Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||