Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||
CHANGES OF TITLE
The following resolution was adopted:
- RESOLVED that the following changes of title be and they are hereby made:
- Mr. Peter S. Baker from Visiting Associate Professor of English to Associate Professor of English, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Richard H. Clarida from Visiting Associate Professor of Economics to Associate Professor of Economics, effective September 1, 1993.
- Mr. William H. Dubbs from Assistant Professor, General Medical Center Faculty to Lecturer, General Medical Center Faculty, for the period May 1, 1992 through June 30, 1993.
- Mr. Shiferaw Gurmu from Acting Assistant Professor of Economics to Assistant Professor of Economics, for four academic years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Dr. Martin A. Hoard from Assistant Professor of Plastic Surgery to Assistant Professor of Plastic Surgery, General Medical Faculty, for three years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Joel W. Hockensmith from Assistant Professor of Biochemistry to Assistant Professor of Biochemistry, General Medical Faculty, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Jimmy A. Knight from Professor of Chemistry, Clinch Valley College, to Lecturer, General Faculty, for three years, effective August 12, 1992.
- Dr. Thomas G. Langer from Assistant Professor of Radiology to Assistant Professor of Radiology, General Medical Faculty, for three years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Ms. Wen-Chin Ouyang from Acting Assistant Professor of Arabic Languages and Literatures to Assistant Professor of Arabic Languages and Literatures, for three academic years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Elizabeth A. Scarlett from Acting Assistant Professor of Spanish to Assistant Professor of Spanish, for three years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Dr. Karen J. Schwenzer from Assistant Professor of Anesthesiology to Assistant Professor of Anesthesiology, General Medical Faculty, for three years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Thomas M. Smith from Research Assistant Professor of Environmental Sciences to Associate Professor of Environmental Sciences, for three academic years, effective September 1, 1993.
- Mr. Wayne L. Smith from Assistant Professor, General Medical Faculty to Lecturer, General Faculty for the period September 1, 1992 through August 31, 1995.
- Dr. Diane G. Snustad from Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine to Assistant Professor of Internal Medicine, General Medical Faculty, for the period August 1, 1992 through June 30, 1995.
- Mr. Rizwan Uddin from Research Assistant Professor of Nuclear Engineering to Assistant Professor of Nuclear Engineering, for three years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Dr. Laszlo Zaborszky from Research Associate Professor of Otolaryngology to Associate Professor of Neurology, General Medical Faculty, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
4502
Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||