Board of Visitors minutes May 23, 1992 | ||
4431
APPOINTMENTS
The following appointments were announced:
- Mr. Michael J. Bednar as Associate Dean for Academics, School of Architecture, for the period January 15, 1992 through June 30, 1994.
- Ms. Bonnie Guiton as Dean, School of Commerce, for five years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Ms. Diane G. Hillman as Assistant to the Vice President for Health Sciences, part time, for the period March 6, 1992 through December 6, 1992.
- Ms. Deborah E. McDowell as Member of the Center for Advanced Studies, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Peter A. Metcalf as Member of the Center for Advanced Studies, for two years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Rouhollah K. Ramazani as Chair, Department of Government and Foreign Affairs, for three academic years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Frederick S. Richardson as Chair, Department of Chemistry, for three years, effective July 1, 1992.
- Dr. Munsey S. Wheby as Senior Associate Dean and Associate Dean for Graduate Medical Education, School of Medicine, for the period July 1, 1992 through March 31, 1996.
- Ms. Margaret M. Williams as Assistant to the Senior Vice President and Chief Financial Officer, for the period April 1, 1992 through June 30, 1995.
Board of Visitors minutes May 23, 1992 | ||