Board of Visitors minutes June 10, 1994 | ||
Retirements
The following retirements were announced:
- Mr. Richard T. Eppink, Associate Professor of Civil Engineering, effective May 31, 1994. Mr. Eppink has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1962.
- Mr. Earl A. Glosser, Associate Professor, General Faculty, effective August 31, 1994. Mr. Glosser has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1967.
- Mr. Samuel J. Goldstein, Associate Professor of Astronomy, effective May 31, 1994. Mr. Goldstein has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1965.
- Dr. Guy Morley Harbert, Jr., Professor of Obstetrics and Gynecology, effective December 31, 1994. Dr. Harbert has been a member of the faculty since January 1, 1963.
- Mr. Peter L. Heath, Professor of Philosophy, effective January 15, 1995. Mr. Heath has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1962.
- Mr. Fulvio A. Iachetta, Associate Professor of Mechanical Engineering, effective May 31, 1994. Mr. Iachetta has been a member of the faculty since September 15, 1954.
- Mr. Robert M. MacLeod, Professor of Internal Medicine, effective June 30, 1994. Mr. MacLeod has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1960.
- Mr. Donald L. McGrady, Professor of Spanish, Italian and Portuguese, effective January 15, 1995. Mr. McGrady has been a member of the faculty since September 1, 1969.
- Mr. K. L. Seshagiri Rao, Professor of Religious Studies, effective January 16, 1995. Mr. Rao has been a member of the faculty since February 1, 1971.
4911
Board of Visitors minutes June 10, 1994 | ||