Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||
ELECTION OF PART-TIME FACULTY
- Mr. Emmanuel K. Akyeampong as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Laura A. Belmonte as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Susan H. Blanton as Research Assistant Professor of Pediatrics, for the period March 1, 1992 through June 30, 1992.
- Mr. John K. Brown as Assistant Professor of Humanities, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Michelle L. Canfield as Instructor in Economics, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Glenn R. Chafetz as Lecturer, General Faculty, for the period April 1, 1992 through June 30, 1992.
- Ms. Catherine C. Cutbill as Lecturer in Women's Studies, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Jin Dewen as Visiting Professor of Mechanical Engineering, for the period May 12, 1992 through November 11, 1992.
- Ms. Mary E. Driskill as Lecturer in Architecture, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. George D. Emmitt as Research Associate Professor of Environmental Sciences, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Austin L. Errico as Lecturer in Education, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Colette L. Gaudin as Professor of French, for the period June 21, 1992 through July 3, 1992.
- Mr. Marvin S. Goodfriend as Visiting Professor of Economics, for one semester, effective January 17, 1993.
- Mr. Ronald C. Gordon as Research Assistant Professor of Biomedical Engineering, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Ms. Sandra S. Hodge as Lecturer in Planning, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Margaret K. Holden as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Roger E. Jones as Lecturer in Education, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Matthias E. Kayhoe as Professor of Architecture, for three academic years, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Thomas C. Kinnaman as Instructor in Economics, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Kristen J. Klaaren as Instructor in Psychology, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Meryl A. Klein as Instructor in Sociology, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. John R. Leafgren as Lecturer in Slavic Languages and Literatures, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. William B. McAllister as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Wallace T. McKeel, Jr. as Instructor in Civil Engineering, for one semester, effective January 16, 1992.
- Ms. Catherine G. OBrion as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Fidelis Oditah as Research Assistant Professor of Law, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Ms. Jeanmarie Rouhier-Willoughby as Instructor in Slavic Languages and Literatures, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Steven L. Savino as Instructor in Commerce, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Theodore Siedlecki, Jr. as Lecturer in Education, for one year, effective July 1, 1992.
- Mr. Jaroslaw Sobieski as Lecturer in Civil Engineering and Applied Mechanics, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Edward A. Tabri as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Drew E. Vande Creek as Instructor in History, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
- Mr. Jeter M. Watson as Lecturer in Planning, for one semester, effective September 1, 1992.
4470
4471
Board of Visitors minutes October 9, 1992 | ||