Board of Visitors minutes October 6, 1989 | ||
3709
Election of Part-Time Faculty
- Mr. Richard S. Benner as Assistant Professor, General Faculty, for the period September 1, 1989 through December 31, 1989
- Mr. Bing C. Cai as Visiting Professor of Materials Science, for the period April 14, 1989 through October 15, 1989,
- Mr. Wolfgang Christian as Visiting Research Associate Professor of Physics, for the period September 1, 1989 through December 31, 1989
- Mr. Timothy J. Conlan as Visiting Assistant Professor of Government and Foreign Affairs, for one semester, effective September 1, 1989,
- Dr. Cynthia H. Dent as Instructor in Dermatology, General Medical Faculty, for one year, effective July 1, 1989,
- Ms. Yieng-hua Han as Instructor in Mandarin-Chinese, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Ms. Pascale Hashemzadeh as Instructor in French, for one semester, effective January 16, 1990,
- Dr. Charles S. Haworth, Instructor in Neurological Surgery, effective July 1, 1989,
- Mr. Jonathan F. Krell as Instructor in French, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Ms. Karen S. Mallery as Instructor in French, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Mr. Gifford D. Malone as Lecturer in Government and Foreign Affairs and Diplomat in Residence, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Mr. Marc L. Marks as Lecturer in Business Administration, for one semester, effective September 1, 1989
- Ms. Twyla A. Meding as Instructor in French, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Mr. Kenneth Morgan as Visiting Research Professor of Mechanical and Aerospace Engineering, for the period July 3, 1989 through July 28, 1989
- Mr. George A. Ruff as Visiting Research Professor of Physics, for the period May 1, 1989 through January 31, 1990,
- Ms. June L. Triplett as Visiting Professor of Nursing, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Mr. Robert S. Wagman as Lecturer in Classics, for one academic year, effective September 1, 1989
- Mr. Wei-Kang Yuan as Visiting Professor of Chemical Engineering, for one semester, effective January 16, 1990
3710
Board of Visitors minutes October 6, 1989 | ||