Board of Visitors minutes April 1, 1978 | ||
1376
ELECTION OF PART-TIME FACULTY
- Miss Jeane L. Bentley as Lecturer in Education, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mrs. Helen L. Boyle as Instructor in Nursing, for the period February 1, 1978, through May 15, 1978.
- Mr. Cyril F. Chang as Instructor in Economics and French, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Dr. Rufus R. Duffer as Assistant Professor of Family Practice, Lynchburg, for one year, effective January 1, 1978.
- Mrs. Patricia R. Early as Lecturer in Education, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Dr. William S. Erwin, Jr., as Clinical Associate Professor of Internal Medicine, Roanoke Program, for the period October 1, 1977, through June 30, 1980.
- Mr. Frank H. Featherston as Lecturer in Engineering Science and Systems, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. Winthrop P. Hambley as Instructor in Economics, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mrs. Eunice Hartman as Instructor in Nursing, for the period February 1, 1978, through May 15, 1978.
- Miss Barbara Ann Jones as Instructor in Anthropology, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. Harry N. Kypraios as Instructor in Economics, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. Terry L. Medley as Instructor in Sociology, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. John C. Nicholas as Visiting Assistant Professor of Mechanical Engineering, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. John J. Pezzoli as Lecturer in Planning, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Miss Pamela J. Salsberry as Instructor in Nursing, for two months, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. Marc R. Schloss as Instructor in Anthropology, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
- Mr. Russell T. Werner as Lecturer in Education, for one semester, effective January 16, 1978.
1377
Board of Visitors minutes April 1, 1978 | ||